House | 04/28/2022 | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 19 Nays: 58 | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | Title restored | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | Amended | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | House Rule suspended | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Title stricken | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/05/2021 | Referred to Rules | ||
House | 04/05/2021 | Withdrawn from General Government Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/08/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Emergency passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 9 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 8 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/25/2021 | Emergency added | ||
Senate | 02/25/2021 | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Bergstrom |