Senate | 04/23/2021 | Approved by Governor 04/23/2021 | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 15 | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | CR; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/08/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/01/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom | ||
Senate | 02/25/2021 | Emergency added | ||
Senate | 02/25/2021 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Coauthored by Representative McDugle (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Coleman |