House | 04/04/2022 | CR; Do Pass Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/21/2022 | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Referred to Legislative Actuary under 62 O.S., Section 3108 | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Ford (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Taylor |