House | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 8 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/09/2021 | Remove as coauthor Senator Boren | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Boren | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Daniels |