Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB330 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 4, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 22, 2021

Amended

Bill April 6, 2021
Bill February 3, 2021