Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB347 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 22, 2021
Bill March 8, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 3, 2021

Amended

Bill March 31, 2021
Bill February 25, 2021