Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB364 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 4, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 22, 2021

Amended

Bill April 1, 2021
Bill February 8, 2021