Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB379 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2021

Engrossed

Bill February 12, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 26, 2021

Amended

Bill April 15, 2021
Bill February 3, 2021