Senate
|
05/07/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/07/2021
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 22
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Bergstrom
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Strom (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Coleman
|
|
|