Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB4 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 16, 2020

Engrossed

Bill March 11, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 19, 2021

Amended

Bill March 31, 2021
Bill February 4, 2021