Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB409 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/14/2021

                     
 
 
Req. No. 820 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 58th Legislature (2021) 
 
SENATE BILL 409 	By: Bergstrom 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to the Oklahoma Research and 
Development Incentive s Act; amending 68 O.S. 2011, 
Section 54003, which relates to sales and use tax 
exemption for qualified purchases; modifying time 
period during which specified exemption may be 
claimed; updating statutory reference; and providing 
an effective date. 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     68 O.S. 2011, Section 54003, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 54003. A.  There are hereby specifically exempted from 
the taxes levied by Section 1354 a nd Section 1402 of Title 68 of the 
Oklahoma Statutes this title sales of qualified purchases made after 
July 1, 1992, and before January 1, 2022, to a qualified purchaser 
which is primarily engaged in computer services and data processing 
as defined under Industria l Group Numbers 7372, 7373, 7374 and 7375 
of the SIC Manual, latest revision, or a quali fied purchaser which 
is primarily engaged in research and development as defined under 
Industrial Group Numbers 8731, 8732, 8733 and 8734 of the SIC 
Manual, latest revision.   
 
 
Req. No. 820 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
B.  A qualified purchaser which is primarily engaged in computer 
services and data processing as defined under Industrial Group 
Number 7374 of the SIC Manual, latest revision, shall be required to 
have a minimum of One Hundred Thousand Dollars ($100, 000.00) in 
qualified purchases in order to be eligi ble to receive the exemption 
provided for in this section. 
C.  In order to be eligible to receive the exemption provided 
for in this section, a new or expanding business shall not include 
the existing employee positions of any business enterprise that is 
directly or beneficially owned by a co rporation, trust, joint 
venture, proprietorship, or partnership doing business in this state 
as of January 1, 1992. 
D.  Eligibility to receive the exemption provided fo r in this 
subsection pursuant to the requirement to derive fifty percent (50%) 
of revenues from out-of-state buyers or consumers and pursuant to 
the requirement that the business be primarily engaged in computer 
services and data processing or in research and development shall be 
established, subject to re view by the Oklahoma Tax Commission, by 
annually filing an affidavit with the Oklahoma Tax Commission 
stating that the business so qualifies and such other information as 
required by the Commission.  For p urposes of determining whether 
annual gross revenue s are derived from sales to out -of-state buyers 
or consumers, all sales to the federal government shall be 
considered to be sales to an out -of-state buyer or consumer.   
 
 
Req. No. 820 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2021. 
 
58-1-820 QD 1/14/2021 9:40:04 PM