SB409 HFLR Page 1 BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES - FLOOR VERSION STATE OF OKLAHOMA 1st Session of the 58th Legislature (2021) ENGROSSED SENATE BILL NO. 409 By: Bergstrom of the Senate and Fetgatter of the House An Act relating to the Oklahoma Research and Development Incentives Act; amending 68 O.S. 2011, Sections 54003 and 54004, which relate to the exemption of sales and use taxes for qualified purchases; modifying time period during which specified exemption may be claimed; modifying time period during which quali fied purchase may be eligible for refund; updating statutory references; and providing an effective date . BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: SECTION 1. AMENDATORY 68 O.S. 2011, Section 54003, is amended to read as follows: Section 54003. A. There are hereby specifically exempted from the taxes levied by Section 1354 and Section 1402 of Title 68 of the Oklahoma Statutes this title sales of qualified purchases made after July 1, 1992, and before January 1, 2 022, to a qualified purchaser which is primarily engaged in computer services and data processing as defined under Industrial Group Numbers 7372, 7373, 7374 and 7375 SB409 HFLR Page 2 BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 of the SIC Manual, latest revision, or a qualified purchaser which is primarily engaged in research and development as defined under Industrial Group Numbers 8731, 8732, 8733 and 8734 of the SIC Manual, latest revision. B. A qualified purchaser which is primarily engaged in computer services and data processing as defined under Industrial Grou p Number 7374 of the SIC Manual, latest revision, shall be required to have a minimum of One Hundred Thousand Dollars ($100,000.00) in qualified purchases in order to be eligible to receive the exemption provided for in this section. C. In order to be eli gible to receive the exemption provided for in this section, a new or expanding business shall not include the existing employee positions of any business enterprise that is directly or beneficially owned by a corporation, trust, joint venture, proprietors hip, or partnership doing business in this state as of January 1, 1992. D. Eligibility to receive the exemption provided for in this subsection pursuant to the requirement to derive fifty percent (50%) of revenues from out -of-state buyers or consumers and pursuant to the requirement that the business be primarily engaged in computer services and data processing or in research and development shall be established, subject to review by the Oklahoma Tax Commission, by annually filing an affidavit with the Okl ahoma Tax Commission stating that the business so qualifies and such other information as SB409 HFLR Page 3 BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 required by the Commission. For purposes of determining whether annual gross revenues are derived from sales to out -of-state buyers or consumers, all sales to the fe deral government shall be considered to be sales to an out -of-state buyer or consumer. SECTION 2. AMENDATORY 68 O.S. 2011, Section 54004, is amended to read as follows: Section 54004. A. In order to administer the exemption for sales to a qualified computer services, data processing or research and development facility as provided by Section 7 of this act Section 54003 of this title , there shall be made a sales tax refund for state and local sales taxes paid by the account create d by this section to such qualified facility. B. The Oklahoma Tax Commission shall transfer each month from sales tax collected the amount which the Commission estimates to be necessary to make the sales tax refund provided by this section to an account designated as the Commission determines. C. Any refund shall be paid from the account prescribed by this section at the time the claim for refund is approved by the Oklahoma Tax Commission. The amount of the refund shall not exceed the total state and local sales taxes paid together with accrued interest upon such total. The amount of interest paid to a qualified computer services, data processing or research and development facility upon the principal amount of any refund made to such qualified facility for purposes of administering the exemption provided by Section 7 of SB409 HFLR Page 4 BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 this act Section 54003 of this title , shall be determined according to the provisions of this subsection. For any month during which the Oklahoma Tax Commission transfers a sum to the ac count prescribed by subsection B of this section, the Commission shall determine an interest rate by determining the rate of interest paid for a three-month Treasury Bill of the United States government as of the first working day of the month in which the transfer is made. The interest rate so determined shall accrue upon the amount transferred to the account. In each subsequent month, the Commission shall determine the interest rate paid for a three -month Treasury Bill of the United States government as of the first working day of the month and such interest rate shall accrue upon any amount transferred during the month and upon the amounts previously transferred to the account together with interest previously accrued upon such amounts. D. For purposes of this section, state and local sales taxes paid by a contractor or subcontractor for qualified purchases as defined in Section 6 of this act Section 54002 of this title , purchased by that contractor or subcontractor pursuant to a contract with a qualified computer services, data processing or research and development facility shall, upon proper showing, be refunded to such qualified facility. SB409 HFLR Page 5 BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 E. The qualified computer services, data processing or research and development facility shall file with the Okl ahoma Tax Commission the following documentation for any refund claimed: 1. Invoices indicating the amount of state and local sales tax billed; 2. Affidavit of each vendor that state and local sales tax billed has not been audited, rebated, or refunded t o such qualified facility but rather the sales tax charged has been collected by the vendor and remitted to the Oklahoma Tax Commission; and 3. All additional documentation required to be submitted pursuant to rules promulgated by the Oklahoma Tax Commiss ion. F. In the event that state and local sales tax was paid by a contractor or subcontractor, the qualified computer services, data processing or research and development facility shall file with the Oklahoma Tax Commission all documentation required in subsection E of this section but in lieu of the affidavit of each vendor the qualified facility shall file, for any refund claimed, an affidavit from the contractor or subcontractor stating that the sales tax refund of the qualified facility is based on st ate and local sales tax paid by the contractor or subcontractor on qualified purchases as defined in Section 6 of this act Section 54002 of this title , purchased and that the amount of state and local sales tax claimed was paid to the vendor and no credit, refund, or rebate has been claimed by the contractor or subcontractor. SB409 HFLR Page 6 BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 G. Only sales of qualified purchases as defined in Section 6 of this act Section 54002 of this title , made after July 1, 1992 , and before January 1, 2022 , shall be eligible for the re fund established by this section. H. The qualified computer services, data processing or research and development facility shall file, within thirty -six (36) months of the date of the first purchase which is exempt from taxation pursuant to the provisions of Section 7 of this act Section 54003 of this title, with the Oklahoma Tax Commission a certification issued by the Employment Security Commission in order to qualify for the refund authorized by this section. I. Notwithstanding the provisions of any st ate tax law, the amount refunded under this section shall be assessed if the number of new full-time-equivalent employees drops below the number prescribed in Section 6 of this act Section 54002 of this title , at any time within thirty -six (36) months of t he date certification is issued by the Oklahoma Employment Security Commission. SECTION 3. This act shall become effective November 1, 2021. COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS AND BUDGET, dated 04/15/2021 - DO PASS.