Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/28/2021
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Floyd
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 36 Nays: 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
CCR adopted, GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
CCR read, GCCA
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Conference granted, naming GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
SCs named GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services sub-committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Referred to Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator McCortney
|
|
|