Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB44 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 2, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 13, 2021

Amended

Bill April 1, 2021
Bill February 24, 2021