Senate | 04/28/2021 | Approved by Governor 04/28/2021 | ||
Senate | 04/22/2021 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/22/2021 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 03/31/2021 | CR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/25/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Fetgatter (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Paxton |