Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB463 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 22, 2021
Bill March 15, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2021

Amended

Bill March 30, 2021
Bill February 24, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 23, 2021