Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/10/2021
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Higher Education and Career Tech Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Referred to Higher Education and Career Tech
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Nollan (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Emergency removed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2021
|
Remove as author Senator Dahm; authored by Senator Pugh
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Dahm
|
|
|