Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB49 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 24, 2020

Engrossed

Bill March 2, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 19, 2021

Amended

Bill March 30, 2021
Bill February 10, 2021