House | 04/12/2022 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
House | 04/12/2022 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 18 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Coauthored by Pae | ||
Senate | 02/10/2021 | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/09/2021 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/09/2021 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/09/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Thompson | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Montgomery |