Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB529 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 26, 2021

Amended

Bill April 7, 2021
Bill February 9, 2021