Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/20/2021
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 25
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Energy and Natural Resources Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2021
|
Referred to Energy and Natural Resources
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2021
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2021
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Energy committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Energy Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|