House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/04/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Jett | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Hamilton | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Mize (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Stephens | ||
Senate | 02/08/2021 | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Dahm |