House | 03/31/2021 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 8 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Hamilton | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Coauthored by Representative West (Rick) (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom | ||
Senate | 02/08/2021 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Dahm |