Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB568 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 15, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 13, 2021

Amended

Bill March 29, 2021
Bill February 12, 2021