Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/03/2021
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Talley
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Miller
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Lepak
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) McEntire
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2021
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Rader
|
|
|