Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Rogers
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 6
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
Emergency removed
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Withdrawn from Calendar; referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2021
|
CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Martinez (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Withdrawn from Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Referred to Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Montgomery
|
|
|