Senate | 04/28/2021 | Approved by Governor 04/28/2021 | ||
Senate | 04/26/2021 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/26/2021 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/22/2021 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 04/05/2021 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Select Agencies Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Select Agencies Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/24/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Boles (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/23/2021 | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Hall | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Remove as author Senator Hall; authored by Senator Howard | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Hall |