Senate
|
05/07/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/07/2021
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Rader
|
|
|