House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/08/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/24/2021 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/10/2021 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services sub-committee | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator McCortney |