Senate | 04/19/2021 | Approved by Governor 04/19/2021 | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 21 | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | CR; Do Pass Government Modernization and Efficiency Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization and Efficiency | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 15 | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/23/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Frix (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Montgomery |