Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB647 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 11, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 15, 2021

Amended

Bill March 31, 2021
Bill February 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 22, 2021