House | 03/24/2021 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Bergstrom | ||
House | 03/24/2021 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/09/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 02/09/2021 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/04/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Ford (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Newhouse |