Senate | 03/01/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/24/2021 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/24/2021 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/19/2021 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/19/2021 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Taylor | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | First Reading |