Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB66 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021
Bill March 2, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2021

Amended

Bill April 1, 2021
Bill February 9, 2021