Senate | 02/25/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Marti (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/09/2021 | Remove as coauthor Senator Boren | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Boren | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Daniels | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | First Reading |