Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB689 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2021
Bill March 11, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2021

Amended

Bill April 9, 2021
Bill February 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 9, 2021