House | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 8 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Phillips | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Remove as principal author Representative Phillips and substitute with Representative Boatman | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Remove as author Senator Leewright; authored by Senator Daniels | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Phillips (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Reported Do Pass Energy committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Energy | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Leewright |