Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB71 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2020

Engrossed

Bill March 3, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 15, 2021

Amended

Bill April 7, 2021
Bill February 10, 2021