Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB714 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 18, 2022
Bill March 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 17, 2022

Amended

Bill April 6, 2021
Bill February 11, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 6, 2021
Bill February 10, 2021