Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB72 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2020

Engrossed

Bill March 15, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 28, 2022

Amended

Bill April 14, 2022
Bill March 3, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 15, 2022