House | 04/07/2021 | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | ||
Senate | 03/15/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/15/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2 | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Title restored | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/19/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Simpson | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Hicks |