Senate | 05/05/2021 | Approved by Governor 05/05/2021 | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Sent to Governor | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Enrolled, to House | ||
Senate | 04/29/2021 | Referred for enrollment | ||
Senate | 04/29/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 04/29/2021 | HAs adopted | ||
Senate | 04/22/2021 | HAs read | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 4 | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Title restored | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Insurance | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/23/2021 | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Montgomery |