Senate | 04/21/2021 | Approved by Governor 04/21/2021 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/14/2021 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 5 | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | CR; Do Pass Tourism Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Second Reading referred to Tourism | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/01/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Bashore (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/24/2021 | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/19/2021 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/19/2021 | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Hall | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Remove as author Senator Hall; authored by Senator Leewright | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Hall |