House | 04/25/2022 | Remove Representative McDugle as principal House author and substitute with Representative Stinson | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Title restored | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Wildlife Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Wildlife | ||
Senate | 03/15/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/15/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 7 | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Dossett (J.J.) | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2021 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/08/2021 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/08/2021 | Reported Do Pass as amended Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Coauthored by Representative McDugle (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Murdock |