Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB79 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 3, 2020

Engrossed

Bill March 3, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 14, 2021

Amended

Bill March 25, 2021
Bill February 21, 2021