Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB812 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 4, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 26, 2021

Amended

Bill April 9, 2021
Bill February 23, 2021