Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB818 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/21/2021

                     
 
 
Req. No. 1178 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 58th Legislature (2021) 
 
SENATE BILL 818 	By: Hamilton 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to soldiers and sailors; am ending 72 
O.S. 2011, Section 229, as amen ded by Section 3, 
Chapter 100, O.S.L. 2018 (72 O.S. Supp. 2020, Section 
229), which relates to the veterans center at 
Talihina; eliminating authorization to transfer 
veterans center location; repealing Section 2, 
Chapter 100, O.S.L. 2018, as amended by Section 2, 
Chapter 502, O.S.L. 2019 (72 O.S. Supp. 2020, Section 
229.1), which relates to transfer of Talihina 
veterans center; and providing an effective date. 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF O KLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     72 O.S. 2011, Sec tion 229, as 
amended by Section 3, Chapter 100, O.S.L. 2018 (72 O.S. Supp. 20 20, 
Section 229), is amended to read as follows: 
Section 229. A.  Until operations are transferred pursu ant to 
subsection B of this section, ther e There is hereby established, in 
addition to the Oklahoma Veterans Centers established by Sections 
221 and 226 of this title, the Oklahoma Veterans Center at Talihina, 
Oklahoma, on the site of the Oklahoma State Sa natorium, Talihina, 
Oklahoma.  All person s serving as employees of the Okl ahoma State 
Sanatorium under the provisions of the State Merit System of   
 
 
Req. No. 1178 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
Personnel Administration shall continue to serve as employees of the 
Oklahoma Veterans Center at Talihina ,; provided, that such employees 
remain in the classified service.  All employee s hired by the 
Oklahoma Veterans Center at Talihina on or after the effective date 
of this act June 4, 1975, shall be under the Oklahoma Merit System 
of Personnel Administration, except one manage r, one principal 
assistant or deputy, one private secretary, part -time physicians and 
other professional personnel engaged in clinical and consultant 
services. The average number of full -time-equivalent employees 
utilized in the total operation of the Okla homa Veterans Center, 
Talihina, shall not exceed one hundred fifty -three (153) during the 
fiscal year ending June 30, 1976.  The buildings, equipment and land 
under the jurisdiction of the Oklahoma State Sanatorium, Talihina, 
are hereby transferred to the Oklahoma Veterans Center, Talihina. 
B.  Operations of the Oklahoma Veteran s Center established 
pursuant to this section shall continue until such time as 
operations are transferred to the location identified pursuant to 
the authority conferred upon the Okl ahoma Veterans Commission under 
Section 2 of this act . 
SECTION 2.     REPEALER     Section 2, Chapter 100, O.S.L. 2018, 
as amended by Section 2, Chapter 502, O.S.L. 2019 (72 O.S. Supp. 
2020, Section 229.1), is hereby repealed. 
 
   
 
 
Req. No. 1178 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SECTION 3.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2021. 
 
58-1-1178 MR 1/21/2021 3:17:11 PM