Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Quinn
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Haste
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Vetoed 04/28/2021
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 11
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Lepak
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Dossett (J.A.)
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis, Marti, Dempsey, Hilbert, Olsen, Phillips, Johns, Humphrey, Sterling, Fugate, West (Tammy), Kerbs, Vancuren, Gann, Smith, McBride, Hasenbeck, Roe, Dobrinski, Kendrix, Caldwell (Chad), Ranson, Hardin (David), Fetgatter, ODonnell, Virgin, May, Roberts (Dustin), Newton, Lowe (Dick), Talley, Randleman, West (Josh), McCall, Townley, Conley, Burns, Boatman, Cornwell, Bashore, Strom, Miller, Lawson, Luttrell, Culver, Russ, Ford, Sims, McDugle, Walke, Cruz, Wallace, Echols, Nichols, Provenzano, Patzkowsky, Manger, Bush, Worthen, Bennett, CrosswhiteHader, West (Kevin), Rosecrants, Williams, Sneed, Caldwell (Trey), Baker
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Dossett (J.J.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Remove as coauthor Senator Daniels
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Burns
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Coleman
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2021
|
Coauthored by Boles
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Pederson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Boren
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2021
|
Coauthored by Pae
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Placed on General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Taylor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Coauthored by Grego
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Coauthored by Frix
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Jech
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
Coauthored by Moore
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Hall
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Hamilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Simpson
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Dugger
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Weaver
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Hicks
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Standridge
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Rogers
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Stanley
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Daniels
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Pemberton
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Kidd
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Murdock
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator McCortney
|
|
|