House | 04/06/2021 | Emergency added | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | Title stricken | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/19/2021 | Coauthored by Representative ODonnell (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Howard |