Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/10/2021
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Newton (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Murdock
|
|
|